HI HB1192 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a time share plan's disclosure of the financial obligation of the purchaser to consist of: (1) A statement that the purchaser is obligated to pay the initial price in the purchase agreement; and (2) A list or description of any additional charges. Clarifies that a sales or acquisition agent is not required to provide any promotional device or instrument to a prospective purchaser prior to making a sales presentation. Repeals the prohibition on selling, offering to sell, advertising for sale, or otherwise offering to give away any tourist activity with the purpose of inducing a person to purchase a time share plan or to attend a time share marketing event.
Title
Time Shares; Disclosures; Prohibited Activities
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Rida Cabanilla Arakawa [D] |
Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. Gene Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB913 (Same As)
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1192&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB1192_.HTM |