HI HB1206 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-02 - Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-02 - Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the University of Hawaii sustainability office. Appropriates funds.
Title
University of Hawaii Sustainability Office; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB707 (Same As) 2015-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1206&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB1206_.HTM |