HI HB1212 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1212
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Transit Oriented Development Authority. (HB1212 HD2)
Title
Relating To Urban Redevelopment.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-17 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 686) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-02-15 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kong, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen, Say, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Wednesday, 02-15-17 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2). |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported from TRN/HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 214) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL. |
2017-02-08 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Aquino, Hashem, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2017-02-08 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Brower, Hashem, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN/HSG on Wednesday, 02-08-17 11:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to TRN/HSG, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1212 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).