HI HB1212 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1212
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the office of public-private partnership and the position of state public-private partnership coordinator. Adds design-build-finance-maintain, design-build-operate-maintain, and design-build-finance-operate-maintain project delivery methods to the state procurement code and related conditions and requirements. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2112. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Public-private Partnerships.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3). |
2021-02-12 | House | Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 252) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-02-05 | House | The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Ichiyama, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Ward. |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Friday, 02-05-21 9:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to GVR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1212 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).