HI HB1212 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1212
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - Referred to WTL/AEN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - Referred to WTL/AEN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the water neutrality task force to develop a plan for Hawaii to become water-neutral by the year 2050. Requires the task force to submit a report to the Legislature. Appropriates funds. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Water Neutrality.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to WTL/AEN, WAM. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 210). |
2023-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Matayoshi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1001), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-02-27 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. |
2023-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-27-23 11:30AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-02-15 | House | Reported from EEP/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 454) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-02-09 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-09 | House | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Kahaloa, Perruso, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Ward. |
2023-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WAL on Thursday, 02-09-23 8:35AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to EEP/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1212 (Carry Over) 2023-03-09 - Referred to WTL/AEN, WAM.