HI HB1218 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $ in general obligation bond funds for state capital improvement projects within each county; provided that no funds shall be expended unless the relevant county appropriates $50,000,000 for county capital improvement projects. Takes effect July, 1, 2020. (HB1218 HD1)
Title
Capital Improvement Projects; Fiscal Stimulus
Sponsors
Rep. Pono Chong [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Referred to TIA, WAM. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 236). | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Takai excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Berg, Finnegan, Takai excused (3). | |
2009-03-05 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 728) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2009-02-18 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Pine, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2009-02-13 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-18-09 2:00pm in House conference room 308. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 4 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Pending introduction. |