HI HB1218 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1218
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds out of the works of art special fund to the State foundation on culture and the arts for the integration of works of art projects into several major capital improvement projects. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The State Foundation On Culture And The Arts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1339) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, S. Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Fevella. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-19 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 271). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1030), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger. |
2019-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 510) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-07 | House | The committees on TIA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Holt, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Creagan, DeCoite, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TIA on Thursday, 02-07-19 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to TIA, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1218 (Carry Over) 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.