HI HB1222 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1222
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires each house of the Legislature to establish by its rules, procedures that enable the Legislature to use remote testimony at legislative committee hearings, enable the public to present oral testimony at legislative committee hearings through remote testimony, and accommodate persons with disabilities though remote testimony. Defines "remote testimony".
Title
Relating To Legislative Access Through Remote Testimony.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to LMG, JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB613 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB1222 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to LMG, JHA, referral sheet 3
HB1222 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to LMG, JHA, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Deaf and Blind Task Force
Legislative Access
Remote Legislative Committee Hearings
Remote Testimony
State Legislature
Legislative Access
Remote Legislative Committee Hearings
Remote Testimony
State Legislature
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1222&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1222_.HTM |