HI HB1226 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a five-year joint city-state roads-in-limbo pilot project for roadway and street repairs and resurfacing to specified roadways and streets. Places the project under the joint jurisdiction of the state department of transportation and the department of transportation services of the city and county of Honolulu. Makes a matching appropriation to the city and county of Honolulu. Clarifies that no liability attaches to the State or city and county of Honolulu for repairs and resurfacing. Clarifies that no ownership or control by the State or city and county of Honolulu is to be inferred from the making of repairs and maintenance. Repeals 6/30/20.
Title
Transportation; Appropriation; Road Repairs; City and County of Honolulu; Roads-in-limbo ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB487 (Same As) 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to TRE/PSM/JDL, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1226&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB1226_.HTM |