HI HB1226 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1226
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - The committee(s) on HET recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Higher Education & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - The committee(s) on HET recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Higher Education & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the government's use of facial recognition systems, except in certain circumstances. Does not apply to personal use of a privately owned facial recognition system when acting in an unofficial capacity.
Title
Relating To Violation Of Privacy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on HET recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Friday, 02-05-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to HET, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1226 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - The committee(s) on HET recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB156 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Re-Referred to GVO/EET, JDC.
SB156 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Re-Referred to GVO/EET, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1226&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB1226_.HTM |