HI HB1227 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1227
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to LHE, JUD, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to LHE, JUD, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires each campus of the University of Hawaii to establish a free speech policy that includes a process for students to report alleged violations of free speech rights. Requires the policy to be disseminated to certain employees and be included in the campus's student handbook, student orientation program, and website. Requires annual report summarizing any complaints alleging violation of free speech rights.
Title
Relating To Free Speech.
Sponsors
Rep. Val Okimoto [R] | Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
Rep. David Tarnas [D] | Rep. Lisa Kitagawa [D] | Rep. Dale Kobayashi [D] | Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LHE, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1227 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to LHE, JUD, referral sheet 6
SB28 (Same As) 2019-01-17 - Referred to CPH.
SB28 (Same As) 2019-01-17 - Referred to CPH.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1227&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1227_.HTM |