HI HB123 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB123
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment to limit the terms of members of the legislature to a maximum of sixteen years in the house of representatives or senate, or both, for terms beginning on or after the general election of 2024.
Title
Proposing An Amendment To Article Iii, Section 4, Of The Constitution Of The State Of Hawaii To Establish Legislative Term Limits.
Sponsors
Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] |
Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB123 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
SB1301 (Same As) 2021-02-01 - Referred to JDC.
SB1301 (Same As) 2021-02-01 - Referred to JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=123&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB123_.HTM |