HI HB123 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB123
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for noise control infractions to be processed under the traffic and emergency period infractions adjudication process. Grants the district court concurrent jurisdiction over noise control infractions committed by minors.
Title
Relating To Noise Control.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-17 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
HB123 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
SB224 (Same As) 2024-03-25 - Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 457).
SB224 (Same As) 2024-03-25 - Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 457).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=123&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB123_.HTM |