HI HB1238 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1238
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a candidate committee shall not be required to file a statement of information for electioneering communications made by a candidate committee that clearly identifies the communication as being paid for by the candidate committee. Repeals the requirement that a candidate committee file a statement of information of the names and addresses of all persons who contributed to the committee or the organization for the purpose of publishing or broadcasting the electioneering communications.
Title
Relating To Elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1238 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1238&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1238_.HTM |