HI HB1241 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1241
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes professional land surveyors and their assistants to enter private property to perform land surveying, subject to certain provisions. Shields land surveyors and their assistants from prosecution under criminal trespass laws when performing their duties. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Right Of Entry For Professional Surveyors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDC. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 420). |
2023-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Amato, Pierick voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1062) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-03-02 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-28 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-02-23 2:00PM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-28 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-02-23. |
2023-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-28-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Amato, Pierick voting no (2) and none excused (0). |
2023-02-15 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 487) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2023-02-09 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Onishi, Tam; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Amato; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Pierick; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-09-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1241&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1241_HD2_.HTM |