HI HB1251 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Act 234, on 07/13/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1343).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Act 234, on 07/13/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1343).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires state departments, upon the closure of facilities, to consider the facility's suitability for use by public charter schools or early learning programs that are affiliated with a public charter school, and to notify the Superintendent and State Public Charter School Commission of the availability and suitability of the facility. Requires more detailed annual reporting by the BOE on public charter school funding. Establishes a Charter School Facilities Funding Working Group, exempt from Chapter 92, HRS, within the DOE to operate in an advisory capacity on issues regarding charter school facilities funding. (HB1251 CD1)
Title
State Public Charter Schools Commission; Facilities Funding ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Lauren Matsumoto [R] |
Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-14 | House | Act 234, on 07/13/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1343). |
2015-07-14 | Senate | Act 234, 07/13/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1343). |
2015-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 74). |
2015-05-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 74) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-04-30 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-04-30 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Luke, Ing, Kong, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2015-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-28-15 2:05PM in conference room 329. |
2015-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-24-15 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 628). |
2015-04-21 | House | House Conferees Changed: Representative Kong added as Conferee. Representative Say discharged as Conferee. |
2015-04-21 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-22-15 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Tokuda, Dela Cruz Co-Chairs; Kouchi, Slom. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takumi, Luke Co-Chairs; Ing, Say, Matsumoto. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 610) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1462) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-15 1:30PM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Reported from EDU/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 971) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Tokuda. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Harimoto, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Nishihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Kouchi. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-15 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to EDU/GVO, WAM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 116). |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 639), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola. |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-26-15 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 462) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-11 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Choy, Ichiyama, Ing, Kong, LoPresti, Say, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Ito. |
2015-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-11-15 2:10PM in conference room 309. |
2015-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-11-15. |
2015-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 02-09-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB836 (Same As) 2015-03-27 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6).