HI HB1256 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes net-metering compensation system for consumers that generate electricity that is fed onto the grid by providing for feed-in tariff for electricity sold to the electric utility and retail rate for electricity supplied to customer-generators. Effective July 1, 2013.
Title
Feed In Tariff; Electricity;
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-27 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-27-13 3:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-25 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-27-13. |
2013-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-25-13 2:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 7 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1256&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB1256_.HTM |