HI HB1257 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands application of the general excise tax to business activities in the State that are significantly associated with a seller's ability to establish or maintain a market in the State. Creates a presumption under the general excise tax law for sellers of tangible personal property where the seller's activities in the State demonstrate a significant business nexus with the State. Creates a presumption under the use tax law that a seller is engaged in business in the State if the seller's activities in the State demonstrate a significant business nexus with the State. Effective July 1, 2030. (HB1257 HD1)
Title
General Excise Tax; Use Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 342). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cheape, Fale, Fukumoto, Johanson, Kobayashi, McDermott, Thielen, Ward voting no (8) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Cheape, Johanson voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, Fukumoto, McDermott, Thielen, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Coffman, Hanohano, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5). |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 747) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Ward; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-28-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |