HI HB1277 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that the board of land and natural resources conduct public hearings prior to awarding a lease of public land to a renewable energy producer.
Title
DLNR; Renewable Energy Producer; Public Notice; Public Lands; Lease
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Chang [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Kymberly Pine [R] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to WLO/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 4 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1277&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB1277_.HTM |