HI HB1277 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-29 - (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-29-11 at 5:00pm in Conference Room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-29 - (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-29-11 at 5:00pm in Conference Room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of general obligation bonds for the statewide agriculture water use and development study to be completed by the department of agriculture. Effective 7/1/2030. (SD2)
Title
Statewide Agriculture Water Use and Development Study
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Barbara Marumoto [R] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-29-11 at 5:00pm in Conference Room 224. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-11 9:45AM in conference room 224. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday, 04-28-11 at 11:00AM in Conference Room 224. | |
2011-04-27 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-11 9:00AM in conference room 224. | |
2011-04-26 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-11 9:00AM in conference room 224. | |
2011-04-25 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-26-11 9:00AM in conference room 224. | |
2011-04-21 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-25-11 3:30PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-21-11 9:00AM in conference room 224. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 644). | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-11 3:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Nishihara, Chair; Kidani, Kouchi, Co-Chair(s); Solomon, Slom. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 584). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) House conferees appointed: Tsuji, Chang, Hashem Co-Chairs; Kawakami, Tokioka, Riviere. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 573). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 569) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1142) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-03-30 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. | |
2011-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-11 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-22 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-03-22 | (S) Reported from AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 831) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-03-17 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kahele, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi, Slom. | |
2011-03-14 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-11 2:55PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to AGL, WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 299). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 888) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-02 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-02-11 12:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-16 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Chong, Souki, Wooley excused (3). | |
2011-02-16 | (H) Reported from AGR/WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 324) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-09 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Cabanilla, Coffman, Herkes, Ito, Morita, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Carroll, Chong. | |
2011-02-09 | (H) The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Tsuji, Hashem, Awana, Brower, Choy, Evans, McKelvey, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Marumoto. | |
2011-02-07 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-09-11 11:45AM in conference room 312. | |
2011-02-07 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-09-11. | |
2011-02-03 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR/WLO on Monday, 02-07-11 11:15AM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to AGR/WLO, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |