HI HB1293 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1293
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of land and natural resources to develop an intake and dispatch training program to enable the department to efficiently and effectively receive and respond to information and reports relating to conservation and resource enforcement matters received on the division of conservation and resource enforcement's direct line. Appropriates funds to the department of land and natural resources to establish one full-time equivalent (1.0 FTE) permanent civil service position to provide intake and dispatcher services for the division of conservation and resource enforcement.
Title
Relating To Conservation And Resource Management.
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1293 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Civil Service Position
Conservation and Resource Management
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Dispatcher
Civil Service Position
Conservation and Resource Management
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Dispatcher
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1293&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1293_.HTM |