HI HB1307 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-25 - (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-11 1:30PM in conference room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-25 - (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-11 1:30PM in conference room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a refundable ohana residential housing income tax credit for qualified taxpayers that purchase a qualified principal residence on or after 04/01/2011, and before 01/01/2013, that is payable to the qualified taxpayer in 2 equal installments over the immediately following 2 taxable years. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Construction Task Force (2010); Tax Credit; Ohana Residential Housing; New Construction
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Jerry Chang [D] | Rep. Pono Chong [D] |
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] |
Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Joey Manahan [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Blake Oshiro [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-25 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-11 1:30PM in conference room 423. | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-11 1:30PM in conference room 423. | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-20-11 1:30PM in conference room 423. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 644). | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Fukunaga, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 584). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) House conferees appointed: McKelvey, Choy Co-Chairs; Cabanilla, Chong, Evans, Har, Marumoto. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 573). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 572) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) One Day Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1228) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Slom. | |
2011-04-06 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-08-11 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-30 | (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure. | |
2011-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-11 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-23 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-03-23 | (S) Reported from EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 867) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-03-21 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Fukunaga, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Solomon, Slom. | |
2011-03-14 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-11 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to EDT, WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 304). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Hanohano, Jordan, C. Lee, Wooley voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 801), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-02 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-02-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-02-11 10:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3). | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 503) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-17 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Brower, Evans, Hashem, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Tsuji, Marumoto, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by ERB on Thursday, 02-17-11 9:00AM in House conference room 312. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to ERB, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB654 (Same As) 2011-03-24 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3).