HI HB1314 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to HOU/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to HOU/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the emergency home relocation special fund to assist persons dispossessed of their homes as a result of a natural disaster. Appropriates moneys. (HB1314 HD1)
Title
Emergency Home Relocation Special Fund; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to HOU/PSM, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Reported from HSH/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 987) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Slom. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HSH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Harimoto, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-15 1:25PM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to HSH/PSM, WAM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 120). |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 692), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2015-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-27-15 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Takumi excused (1). |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 198) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-09 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Jordan, Creagan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Oshiro. |
2015-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 02-09-15 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |