HI HB1314 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1314
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Recommitted to FIN with Representative Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no and Representative(s) Matsumoto, Mizuno excused.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Recommitted to FIN with Representative Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no and Representative(s) Matsumoto, Mizuno excused.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes each county to levy a county surcharge on transient accommodations tax if the county satisfies certain real property tax requirements and requires those counties to remit certain real property tax revenues to the State to offset the reduction in income tax. Repeals the allocation of transient accommodations tax revenue to the counties and makes conforming amendments. Beginning 1/1/2031, requires certain taxpayers to file an information return to the director of taxation. Establishes a landlord low-income tenant tax credit, residential circuit breaker tax credit, and real property tax credit for certain taxpayers. For counties that adopt certain ordinances, beginning with taxable years after 12/31/2021, gradually implements new individual income tax and corporation income tax brackets and lower tax rates in three-year intervals. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Recommitted to FIN with Representative Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no and Representative(s) Matsumoto, Mizuno excused. |
2021-03-09 | House | Deferred one day 03-11-21. |
2021-03-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 960) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-03-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, Nishimoto, Sayama, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marten, Perruso, Tam, Wildberger; 1 Noes: Representative(s) B. Kobayashi; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2021-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-02-21 1:00PM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-25 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-02-21. |
2021-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 12:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) DeCoite, Ganaden, McKelvey, Perruso, Tam voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, McDermott, Okimoto, Tokioka, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 584), recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-02-17 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Takumi. |
2021-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-17-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) DeCoite, Ganaden, Tam, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, McDermott, Okimoto, Perruso voting no (4) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3). |
2021-02-12 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 204) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-02-10 | House | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Okimoto; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 02-10-21 9:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to ECD, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1314 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Recommitted to FIN with Representative Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no and Representative(s) Matsumoto, Mizuno excused.
Subjects
Corporation Income Tax
County Surcharge
Income Tax Rates
Individual Income Tax
Real Property Tax
Transient Accommodations Tax
County Surcharge
Income Tax Rates
Individual Income Tax
Real Property Tax
Transient Accommodations Tax