HI HB1326 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the monetary threshold to $600 with respect to property or services for theft in the second degree. Effective 01/01/2016. (SD1)
Title
Theft in the Second Degree
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Souki [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 964) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, L. Thielen. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-15 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 121). |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Jordan, Keohokalole, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cullen, Fukumoto Chang, Har, Kawakami, Kong, Matsumoto, McDermott, McKelvey, Pouha, Thielen, Tupola, Yamane voting no (12) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-05 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Aquino, Cachola, DeCoite, Har, Jordan, Oshiro, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cullen, Fukumoto Chang, Kawakami, Matsumoto, McDermott, McKelvey, Pouha, Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting no (10) and Representative(s) Say, Souki excused (2). |
2015-03-05 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 590), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-02-26 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Creagan; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Thielen; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, Woodson, McDermott. |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-26-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |