HI HB1330 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1330
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the fiscal biennium 2019-2021 operating budget of the Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs financial services regulation program. (HB1330 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Budget Of The Department Of Commerce And Consumer Affairs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Intrastate Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Intrastate Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 464). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1270) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger. |
2019-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 505), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-14 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Gates, Kong, Nishimoto, Takayama, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-14-19 11:30AM in conference room 430. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-19 at 11:30am. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Tuesday, 02-12-19 9:45AM in House conference room 430. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to IAC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1330 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to CPH, WAM.