HI HB1337 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1337
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes within the Hula Mae Single Family Program a housing downpayment loan program for faculty members of the University of Hawaii. Creates a subaccount for funds for the program within the Housing Finance Revolving Fund.
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-07-17 9:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to HSG, HED, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1337 (Carry Over) 2017-02-07 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1337&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB1337_.HTM |