HI HB1337 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1337
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Therapeutic Psilocybin Working Group.
Title
Relating To Psilocybin.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-15 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2023-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-15-23 11:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-10 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-15-23. |
2023-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-10-23 10:00AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1337 (Carry Over) 2023-02-15 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB1454 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB1454 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1337&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1337_.HTM |