HI HB1350 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits any minor under the age of eighteen from possessing or smoking tobacco products. Takes effect 1/1/2014.
Title
Tobacco; Tobacco Products; Minors
Sponsors
Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-13 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-13 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2013-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-13 at 8:30am. |
2013-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-08-13 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 7 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1350&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB1350_.HTM |