HI HB1360 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes permanent the suspension of certain General Excise Tax and Use Tax exemptions as enacted by Act 105, Session Laws of Hawaii 2011. Effective June 29, 2013.
Title
General Excise Tax; Use Tax; Suspension of Exemptions
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1360&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB1360_.HTM |