HI HB1360 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1360
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, JUD, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, JUD, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the range of manufactured medical marijuana products that may be produced and sold to include certain edible products. Authorizes eight companies to partner with medical marijuana dispensaries to produce manufactured marijuana products, subject to certain conditions. Establishes requirements for manufacturing, handling, and packaging manufactured marijuana products.
Title
Relating To Manufactured Marijuana Products.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Re-referred to HHS, JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-16 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-14 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 02-16-17 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-02-14 | House | Re-referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 19 |
2017-02-09 | House | Re-referred to HLT/CPC, JUD, referral sheet 15 |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1149 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
HB1360 (Carry Over) 2017-02-16 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB1360 (Carry Over) 2017-02-16 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1360&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1360_.HTM |