HI HB1380 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the farm-to-school program in the department of agriculture to increase the procurement of locally-grown fruits and vegetables. Establishes a task force within the department of agriculture to examine the feasibility of establishing school gardens; creating a Hawaii-grown fresh fruit and vegetable program; and advising the department of agriculture in the creation and implementation of the farm-to-school program. Effective July 1, 2030. (SD1)
Title
Hawaii-Grown Produce; Farm-to-School
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-23 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-03-23 | (S) Reported from EDU/AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 865) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-03-18 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. | |
2011-03-18 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kahele, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi, Shimabukuro. | |
2011-03-15 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU/AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-11 1:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to EDU/AGL, WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 318). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 718) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-24 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Coffman. | |
2011-02-22 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-24-11 11:30AM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting no and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 463) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-14 | (H) The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Belatti, Aquino, Awana, Chang, Hanohano, Mizuno, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Saiki, Takai, Wooley, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 02-14-11 2:05PM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-02-09 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). | |
2011-02-09 | (H) Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 135) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN. | |
2011-02-04 | (H) The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Hashem, Awana, Brower, Choy, Evans, McKelvey, Nishimoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka, Marumoto. | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-04-11 9:00AM in House conference room 312. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to AGR, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |