HI HB1384 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1384
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates an income tax credit to incentivize the food manufacturing industry in the State. Effective 6/30/3000. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Manufacturing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Reported from AEN/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1249) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Referred to AEN/EET, WAM. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 442). |
2023-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1173), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-03-01 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Alcos. |
2023-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-23 2:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-02-15 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 469) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-02-08 | House | The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, Hussey-Burdick, Kong, Nakamura, Quinlan, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 02-08-23 10:15AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1384 (Carry Over) 2023-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.