HI HB1385 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that all construction procurements of less than $25,000 for drilling work or soil testing shall be made by competitive sealed bidding, and that the invitation for bids is published on the DAGS website. Establishes that bids for such work shall be separate from bids for engineering work on the same project. Effective July 1, 2013.
Title
Procurement Code; Small Purchases; Drilling Work; Soil Testing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1385&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB1385_.HTM |