HI HB1392 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts amounts received for production of kalo products from general excise and use taxes. Allows for an income tax exemption up to $75,000 for income derived from kalo production.
Title
Kalo Production; General Excise Tax; Use Tax; Income Tax Exemptions
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] |
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Feki Pouha [R] | Rep. Andria Tupola [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB1307 (Same As) 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to WLA, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1392&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB1392_.HTM |