HI HB1392 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1392
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that individuals who first begin employment as a judge, elected official, or legislative officer after 6/30/2023, be subject to the same Employees' Retirement System benefits as other state or county employees who began their employment after 6/30/2012.
Title
Relating To The Employees' Retirement System.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1392 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1392&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/HB1392_.HTM |