HI HB14 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB14
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the employment of lifeguards and for necessary equipment to be used by state lifeguards in their work at Kua Bay, Kekaha Kai State Park in North Kona on the island of Hawaii. Effective March 15, 2099. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Kekaha Kai State Park.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Reported from WTL/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1014) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Inouye, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-17 2:15PM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to WTL/PSM, WAM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 215). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1021) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-17 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-02-14 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 278), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-07 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Gates, Creagan, DeCoite, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-06 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Tuesday, 02-07-17 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2017-01-19 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB14 (Carry Over) 2017-03-23 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB1123 (Same As) 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
SB1123 (Same As) 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.