HI HB1406 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Department of Human Services to establish the Office of Homeless and Community Services and transfer the Office of Community Services from the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations and the homeless programs from the Hawaii Public Housing Authority to the new office. (HB1406 HD2)
Title
Community Services; Homeless
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-20 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting no and Bertram, McKelvey, Takai, Takumi, Tokioka excused. | |
2009-02-19 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 590) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2009-02-17 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Karamatsu, Ito, Belatti, Cabanilla, Herkes, Luke, Mizuno, Morita, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Wakai, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, McKelvey. | |
2009-02-13 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02/17/09 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2009-02-09 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Chang, Takai excused (3). | |
2009-02-06 | (H) Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 102) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2009-02-04 | (H) The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Chong, Chang, Coffman, Har, Ito, C. Lee, Luke, Sagum, Ching, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Herkes, Morita. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Bill re-scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 02-04-09 9:00AM in conference room 325. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 02-04-09 9:00am in House conference room 309. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to HSG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-27 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1182 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.