HI HB1419 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows, for taxable years beginning after 12/31/2014, an exclusion from gross income for up to $10,000 for unreimbursed travel expenses, lodging expenses, and lost wages incurred by a taxpayer who donates an organ, while living, to another person.
Title
Tax Deduction; Organ Donation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB1336 (Same As) 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to TSI/CPH, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1419&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB1419_.HTM |