HI HB1424 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1424
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes how a national organization that regulates collegiate level athletics shall investigate the UH, its athletics programs, or student-athletes. Prohibits private colleges and universities in the state from entering into or remaining in an agreement regarding investigations with a national organization that regulates collegiate level athletics that differs from the requirements for investigations of the UH.
Title
Relating To Collegiate Athletics Investigations.
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-07-17 2:01PM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to HED, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1424 (Carry Over) 2017-02-07 - The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1424&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1424_.HTM |