HI HB1439 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Har, Say excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Har, Say excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Health (DOH)to disclose lists of names of persons whose deaths have been recorded by DOH, to state agencies that maintain official lists of persons and are prohibited by federal law from sharing information from the lists. Effective July 1, 2050. (HB1439 HD1)
Title
Vital Records; Reporting Deaths to State Agencies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Har, Say excused (3). |
2013-02-13 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 368) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-02-08 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Cabanilla, Carroll, Jordan, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-08-13 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 7 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |