HI HB1465 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires affected agencies to account for sea-level rise and minimize risks from coastal hazards such as erosion, storm inundation, hurricanes, and tsunami. Preserves public access and public shoreline access. Extends shoreline setback to not less than 40 feet from shoreline and requires counties to account for annual erosion rates.
Title
Shoreline Setback
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to WLO, JUD, referral sheet 4 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-27 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1465&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB1465_.HTM |