HI HB1473 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-01 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-01 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the permitted uses of campaign funds to include contributions to other candidate committees.
Title
Campaign Financing; Campaign Fund Expenditures
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-16 11:02AM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-22 | House | Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 20 |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1473&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB1473_.HTM |