HI HB1491 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the deferred payment purchase option for cigarette tax stamps. Requires licensees to pay for cigarette tax stamps at the time of purchase using cash, certified check, or bank transfer. Effective 1/1/2023. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Cigarette Tax And Tobacco Tax Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 350-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-02-09 | House | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; and Excused: none. |
2022-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 02-09-22 10:00AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-18 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2376 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Act 015, 04/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1115).