HI HB1519 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-30 - The committee(s) on TOU recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-30 - The committee(s) on TOU recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the deposit of general obligation bond funding into the convention center enterprise fund. Requires the Hawaii Tourism Authority board of directors to approve the use of any general obligation bond proceeds prior to expenditure. Clarifies that convention center enterprise fund moneys may be used for any ongoing or future major repair, maintenance, and improvement of the convention center facility. Declares that the general fund appropriation breaches the expenditure ceiling. Authorizes the issuance of general obligation bonds. Appropriates funds to repair, maintain, and improve the Hawaii convention center.
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Tourism Authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | House | The committee(s) on TOU recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2024-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Tuesday, 01-30-24 10:00AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to TOU, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-05 | House | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Capital Improvements
Convention Center Enterprise Fund
General Obligation Bonds
Hawaii Convention Center
HTA
Capital Improvements
Convention Center Enterprise Fund
General Obligation Bonds
Hawaii Convention Center
HTA
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1519&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1519_.HTM |