HI HB1534 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Act 036, 06/19/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1136).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Act 036, 06/19/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1136).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a waiver of the one-year residency requirement for certain appointive officers when the officer is employed as the head of a county police department. Clarifies that all appointed officers in the service of state or county government, other than the head or deputy or assistant to the head of a state or county department, be residents of the State at the time of their appointment, and citizens, nationals, permanent resident aliens of the United States, or eligible under federal law for unrestricted employment in the United States. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Residence Requirements For Appointed Officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Act 036, 06/19/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1136). |
2017-06-22 | House | Act 036, on 06/19/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1136). |
2017-05-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 638). |
2017-04-28 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, McDermott, Quinlan, Thielen, Tokioka excused (6). |
2017-04-28 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 633). |
2017-04-27 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-13-17. |
2017-04-27 | House | The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Nishimoto, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, Oshiro. |
2017-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-17 1:45PM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 1:50PM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-20-17 1:45PM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kim Chair; Ihara, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Nakashima, Oshiro, Matsumoto. |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 667) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1580) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-04-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 04-07-17 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported from GVO/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1071) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Tokuda. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-17 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to GVO/PSM, JDL. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 362). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1050), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Oshiro, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-28-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3). |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 401) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-02-07 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-07-17 11:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |