HI HB1547 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii Wildfire Relief Fund. Requires the establishment of a Wildfire Reserve Trust Fund to support the Hawaii Wildfire Relief Fund. Authorizes the Director of Commerce and Consumer Affairs to establish a Wildfire Bond Loan Program in conjunction with the Hawaii Wildfire Relief Fund. Authorizes the Director of Budget and Finance to issue revenue bonds and general obligation bonds to support the Hawaii Wildfire Relief Fund. Makes an appropriation.
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Wildfire Relief Fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-12 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2086 (Same As) 2024-01-18 - Referred to CPN, WAM/JDC.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Hawaii Wildfire Relief Fund
Property Insurance
Wildfire Bond Loan Program
Wildfire Insurance
Wildfire Reserve Trust Fund
Hawaii Wildfire Relief Fund
Property Insurance
Wildfire Bond Loan Program
Wildfire Insurance
Wildfire Reserve Trust Fund
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1547&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1547_.HTM |