HI HB1548 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Omnibus tax bill to provide tax equity and stimulate the economy by increasing general excise tax rates, reducing income tax rates, and establishing hotel construction and remodeling tax credit.
Title
Income Tax; General Excise Tax; Corporation Tax; Low-Income Household Renters' Tax Credit; Hotel Construction and Remodeling Tax Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-04 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-03-04 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-04-09 4:15PM in conference room 308. | |
2009-03-04 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 03-04-09. | |
2009-03-03 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-03-09 7:00PM in conference room 308. | |
2009-03-02 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 03-03-09. | |
2009-02-28 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-02-09 5:45pm in conference room 308. | |
2009-02-26 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-02-23 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-26-09 1:00pm in House conference room 308. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 5 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1548&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB1548_.HTM |