HI HB156 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB156
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires insurers, mutual and fraternal benefit societies, and health maintenance organizations to recognize services provided by pharmacists.
Title
Relating To Reimbursement Of Pharmacists.
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-07-17 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-30 | House | Re-referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 1 |
2017-01-20 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB156 (Carry Over) 2017-02-07 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=156&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB156_.HTM |