HI HB1576 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Kapela voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Kapela voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows owners of vehicles to display the front number plate on the inside of the front windshield as an alternative to being securely fastened to the front of the vehicle. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Vehicle Number Plates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Kapela voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3). |
2024-02-14 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 333-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2024-02-08 | House | The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Kitagawa, Miyake, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Thursday, 02-08-24 9:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to TRN, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-16 | House | Prefiled. |